judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CURTIS L. RUSSELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1348
Short Caption:CURTIS L. RUSSELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:88-CF-1348Consolidated: 88-CF-1462
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4302-88Filed Date:10/13/1988

Opening Event Date:10/13/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/20/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/01/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/06/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/13/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCurtis L. Russell N
Elaine J. Mittleman YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
William E. Lawler YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RUSSELL, CURTIS L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: WALLACE THREADGILL NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 011989 ORDER: DENY APLT MO FOR NOTE - 02 RT W/OUT PREJ TO RENEWAL BEFOR NOTE - 03 TR CT FOR CONS IN 1ST INSTANCE NOTE - 03 FO: COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 NOTE - 04 DAYS TO ORDER RT & FILE STATE NOTE - 04 INDICATING SUCH W/THIS CT W/IN NOTE - 05 THAT SAME TIME. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 CON 88-1462 NOTE - 06
10/13/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ELAINE MITTLEMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
12/13/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO REQUEST TRANSCRIPT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 05. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 010489 SCHPRD M
01/31/1989STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) AD PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD STATE
03/01/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD R
04/20/1989FiledRecord Completed
04/20/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(155 PGS/TOOBY) AD PANEL SCDATE 040189 SCHPRD RT
05/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-30-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 053089 SCHPRD BA
06/12/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/30/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 060989 SCHPRD CHECK
06/29/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-31-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD BA
07/06/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/31/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD CHECK
07/31/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD BA
08/22/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THIS APPEAL WITH 88-1462 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO CONS 88- 1348 & 88-1462; BRF OF APLT IN 88-1462 DUE IN 40. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 091989 SCHPRD Q
11/01/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 88-1462 TO NOVEMBER 6, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 110189 SCHPRD BA
11/28/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-1462 MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO FL BRF IN 88-1462; CONSOLIDATED BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD CHECK
12/28/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 29, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 122889 SCHPRD BE
01/19/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLE'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 1/29/90. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 8, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD BE
02/07/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1990APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO MARCH 28, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/01/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO 3/28/90. NXF. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 032890 SCHPRD RBA
11/06/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/06/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWWGGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWWAGA SCDATE 110690 SCHPRD RDEC
11/21/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/13/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD