| ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Seq No. | Charge | Charge Type | Disposition |
---|---|---|---|
1 | PETIT THEFT 1D | MISDEMEANOR | CONV/CTS/FINE/COST |
Additional Info:
| ||||||||||||
Seq. No. | Date | Book/Page | Docket |
---|---|---|---|
32 | 08/26/2010 | COLLECTIONS AGENCY STATUS NEW TO LINEBARGER | |
31 | 05/25/2010 | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PAY SENT | |
29 | 05/22/2009 | STAY GRANTED - DUE 05/22/2010 | |
28 | 05/22/2009 | ORDER SETTING ASIDE BENCH WARRANT | |
26 | 05/22/2009 | CLOSING JUDGE FRANCIS, MARY JO | |
25 | 05/22/2009 | ROR AMT/ 0 DISCHARGED 05/22/2009 POWER/ | |
22 | 05/18/2009 | REPORT RE: STATUS SET FOR 05/22/2009 AT 08:15 | |
21 | 04/29/2009 | LETTER FROM:- CLERK OF COURTS | |
17 | 04/23/2009 | ALTERNATE JUDGE FABER, ROBIN | |
16 | 04/23/2009 | REPORT RE: STATUS SET FOR 04/28/2009 AT 08:15 | |
14 | 03/06/2009 | LETTER FROM:- ROSEMARY ANBER - ONONDAGA COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, N.Y. | |
12 | 02/13/2009 | ARRAIGNMENT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/06/2009 AT 09:30 | |
10 | 01/23/2009 | INFORMATION FILED | |
9 | 01/22/2009 | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER | |
7 | 01/15/2009 | INVALID ADDRESS OVERRIDE PURSUANT TO CLERK | |
5 | 01/14/2009 | INVALID ADDRESS OVERRIDE PURSUANT TO CLERK | |
4 | 01/14/2009 | ROR AMT/ 0 ISSUED 01/14/2009 POWER/ | |
3 | 01/14/2009 | AFFIDAVIT FOR INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT | |
2 | 01/14/2009 | FIRST APPEARANCE/JAIL ARRAIGNMENT - A.M. | |
1 | 01/14/2009 | INVALID ADDRESS OVERRIDE PURSUANT TO BOOKING |