judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM A. JENKINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1337
Short Caption:WILLIAM A. JENKINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1810-88Filed Date:10/06/1988

Opening Event Date:10/06/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/10/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/05/1991
Argued/Submitted:05/29/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/24/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam A. Jenkins N
Edward D. Joseph YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Linda Otani Mckinney YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JENKINS, WILLIAM A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/05/29 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - JOSEPHE FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MCKINNEYL FOR - APPELLEE
10/06/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) EDWARD D. JOSEPH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
02/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD R
03/07/1989DENIED #1(8 PGS/V BREMEN) AD PANEL SCDATE 013189 SCHPRD RT
04/14/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD # (22 PGS. --HART) RJG PANEL SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD RT
06/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(18 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 110189 SCHPRD RT
09/11/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 ( 102 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 100189 SCHPRD RT
09/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD BA
11/01/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD U
09/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (62 PGS. -- BOSTON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022790 SCHPRD RT
10/10/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/04/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 091390 SCHPRD GR
03/05/1991FiledBriefing Completed
03/05/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 030691 SCHPRD BE
04/02/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1991RECEIVED APLT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S UNOPP MOT FOR LV TO FL LODGED REPLY BRIEF. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 040291 SCHPRD VS
04/04/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 041591 SCHPRD OPE
05/29/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/29/1991ARGUED PANELSTSCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF CONVICTIONS APPEALED FROM PANELSTSCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/24/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD