judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERRENCE L. INGRAM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1345
Short Caption:TERRENCE L. INGRAM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5260-88Filed Date:10/06/1988

Opening Event Date:10/06/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/25/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/19/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/22/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/24/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTerrence L. Ingram N
James W. KleinNY
Allen W. Levy YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth H. DanelloYY
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901INGRAM, TERRENCE L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/17/91 ORD: JUDGE FARRELL IS NOTE - 01 RECUSED FROM THIS CASE. NOTE - 02 JUDGE BELSON WAS AN ASSOC. NOTE - 02 JUDGE OF THIS COURT AT TIME OF NOTE - 03 ARGUMENT. HIS STATUS CHANGED NOTE - 03 TO ASSOC. JUDGE, RETIRED, ON NOTE - 04 JUNE 1, 1991. NOTE - 04
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/01/22 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LEVYA FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - DANELLOE FOR - APPELLEE
10/06/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/07/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT DESIGNATING RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
11/14/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD R
07/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(241 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF COURT REPORTER JANIFER TO EXT TM TO FL RT BY 10/31/89; NFX. DAS PANELMK SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD RT
09/25/1989FiledRecord Completed
09/25/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (1009 PGS RT - RHOADES) GT PANEL SCDATE 103189 SCHPRD RT
08/15/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 060190 SCHPRD CHECK
08/15/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION STIPULATION AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1990ORDER GRANTG PARTIES' MO TO SUPP THE REC; CLK TO FILE SUPP REC; BRF OF APLE REMAINS DUE BY 9/19.CC PANELRO SCDATE 082090 SCHPRD TO
08/24/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (ATTACHMENT TO 8/15/90 MO OF PARTIES TO SUPP THE RECORD) CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1990FiledBriefing Completed
09/19/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 091990 SCHPRD BE
12/28/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT FOR LV TO FL REPLY BRIEF. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 123190 SCHPRD VS
01/10/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 010791 SCHPRD
01/22/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/22/1991ARGUED PANELRGFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1991CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1991MEMORANDUM APLT'S LTR RE RULE 28(K) SENT TO DIVISION SL PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -FE CITE 592 A.2d 992
06/05/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 1474
06/21/1991ORDER sua sponte AMENDING OPINION FILED 6/5/91 (PRINTED @ p.1473-A) PANELRGFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1991NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIIN US SUPREME COURT ON 10/15/91 #91-6393 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD