judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIE ANDERSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1302
Short Caption:WILLIE ANDERSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 85-CF-0780 Consolidated:88-CF-1302
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1301-84Filed Date:10/11/1988

Opening Event Date:10/11/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/22/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/06/1989
Argued/Submitted:04/03/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/26/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWillie Anderson N
Gregory B. Macaulay YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kirby D. Behre YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ANDERSON, WILLIE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 85-780 NOTE - 01
10/11/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/24/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GREGORY B. MACAULAY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS MLR PB PANEL SCDATE 110388 SCHPRD DSA
11/28/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 85-780 & TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 85-780 UNTIL BRIEF DUE IN THIS CASE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989ORDER CON 87-780 & 88-1302; CLK OF SUPER CT TO TRANSMIT REC IN 88-1302 FORTHWITH. CWC PANELMK SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD R
02/22/1989FiledRecord Completed
02/22/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD R
04/11/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, ON OR BEF 4/17/89, TO FILE BA OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO VACATE APRIL 11TH ORDER AND TO EXTEND FOR 40 DAYS TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD BA
05/12/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO VACATE 4/11/89 ORD; BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD X
07/03/1989ORDER APLT IN 15 DAYS TO FL BA OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 062289 SCHPRD BA
07/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/1/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 071989 SCHPRD BA
07/18/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO VACATE THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 7-3-89 AND MXBA FOR 40 DAYS AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO VACATE 7/3/89 ORD & BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD OPE
09/12/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 091289 SCHPRD BA
10/16/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-15-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 101189 SCHPRD BE
11/08/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING BE TO AND INCLUDING 11/15/89. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-17-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 111589 SCHPRD BE
11/17/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989FiledBriefing Completed
12/06/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD V
04/03/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/03/1990SUBMITTED PANELTESTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTESTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/26/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD