judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD J. COLEMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1301
Short Caption:RONALD J. COLEMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4652-82Filed Date:10/13/1988

Opening Event Date:10/13/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/17/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/03/1990
Argued/Submitted:04/04/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/26/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald J. Coleman N
David A. CarrNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Nancy R. Page YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COLEMAN, RONALD J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CO-DEFENDANT DONALD J. COLEMAN NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 WITHDRAW MLR NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 8/8/89 ORD: THE APPTMT OF NOTE - 03 DAVID A. CARR, ESQ., AS CNSL NOTE - 04 FOR APLT IS HEREBY VACATED AND NOTE - 04 THE CLK IS DIRTD TO ENTER THE NOTE - 05 APPR OF RONALD J. COLEMAN AS NOTE - 05 REPRESENTING HIMSELF ON THIS NOTE - 06 APPEAL. FO THAT THE BRF OF NOTE - 06 APLT SHALL BE FILED W/I 40 NOTE - 07 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS NOTE - 07 ORDER. NOTE - 08 06/14/90 ORD: GRANTING MOTION NOTE - 08 TO EXTENT THAT MLBA GRTD AND NOTE - 09 CLK DIRED TO FILE APLT'S LODGD NOTE - 09 BRIEF; BE DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. NOTE - 10 09/04/90 ORD: GRANTG APLE'S MO NOTE - 10 TO STAY BRF SCHD & APLE TO FL NOTE - 11 STATMNT W/IN 20 DAYS ADVISING NOTE - 11 THIS CRT OF STATUS OF HIS NOTE - 12 ATTEMPT TO LOCATE RT NEC FOR NOTE - 12 THIS APPEAL
01/01/1906 CARRD VACATED PER 8/8/89 ORDER
10/13/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/24/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID A. CARR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 110388 SCHPRD DSA
11/28/1988RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APLT RE: NON-RECEIPT OF INFORMATION ON APPEALS CASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1988RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APLT RE APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1989LETTER TO APLT RE HIS LTR DATED 11/14/88 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL MLR PANEL SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD R
02/28/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 10TH JB PANEL SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD BA
05/08/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO F BRF TO 5/10/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 042589 SCHPRD OPE
05/18/1989ORDER DIRG APLT TO FILE ITS BRIEF W/IN 20 DAYS. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL, W/IN 15 DAYS, TO FILE BA OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1989ORDER SUA SPONTE VACATING COURT'S ORDER OF 6/20/89 FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1989RECEIVED COPY OF LETTER DATED 6/22/89, FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, TO AT- TORNEY REQUESTING HE (NOTE 2) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS AD PANEL SCDATE 070689 SCHPRD BA
08/08/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 3 THRU 7 SL PANELRO SCDATE 071289 SCHPRD Q
09/22/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 091889 SCHPRD BA
10/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/17/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD M
04/17/1990FiledRecord Completed
04/17/1990ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 10 DAYS OR CASE DISMISSED. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 101789 SCHPRD BA
05/03/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO RE-SET BRIEF- ING SCHEDULE & REINSTITUTE APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 042790 SCHPRD BA
05/23/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1990ORDER (SEE NOTE FIELDS 8 & 9) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO COMPLETE RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD BE
08/27/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S OPPO TO 7-9-90 MO TO EXT. TIME TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 10 THRU 12 GW PANELRO SCDATE 082990 SCHPRD U
09/24/1990STATEMENT OF STATUS OF REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 092490 SCHPRD STATE
11/01/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLEE DUE W/IN 30 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 092890 SCHPRD U
12/03/1990FiledBriefing Completed
12/03/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 120390 SCHPRD BE
01/10/1991APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT (SEE MOTION) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/15/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (COPY OF ORDER J. SHUKER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/20/1991ORDER APLT MO X TM FL REPLY BRF GRNTD TO 3/7/91. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/04/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELFEBERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1991SUBMITTED PANELFEBERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/26/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD