judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID D. GATLIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0547
Short Caption:DAVID D. GATLIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Bail Reform Act
Lead: 89-CM-0546 Consolidated:89-CM-0547
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M3940-89Filed Date:05/11/1989

Opening Event Date:05/11/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/08/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Paul E. Denicoff NN
AppellantDavid D. Gatlin N
Bernadette V. Armani NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GATLIN, DAVID D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 89-546 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 6/21/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 02 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 03 VACATE APPMT OF PAUL DENICOFF NOTE - 03 & APPT BERNADETTE V. ARMANI NOTE - 04 FOR APLT; APLT TO FL DSA IN NOTE - 04 10 DAYS. NOTE - 05 120789 ORD: MOTION TO WITH- NOTE - 05 DRAW HELD IN ABEYANCE; APLT NOTE - 06 TO SHOW CAUSE IN 15 DAYS WHY NOTE - 06 APPEAL SHOULDN'T BE DISMISSED NOTE - 07 FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. NOTE - 07
01/01/1906 DENICOFFP VACATED 6/21/89.
05/11/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/31/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PAUL DENICOFF, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1989ORDER SS, CONS 890546 & 89-547. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF PAUL DENICOFF, COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BERNADETTE V. ARMANI, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 061289 SCHPRD DSA
07/12/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLR PANEL SCDATE 070389 SCHPRD DSA
08/08/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/08/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD R
09/19/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 18TH JB PANEL SCDATE 091889 SCHPRD BA
10/02/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/18/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD OPE
10/27/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 101889 SCHPRD BA
12/07/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-07. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 111589 SCHPRD Q
01/22/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
01/22/1990ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO RESPOND TO 12/27/89 ORDER. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD Q
01/22/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
02/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD