Case: 96-0478
96-0478
05/22/1996
application for writ of error granted by Court
THE SOUTHLAND CORPORATION and 7-11 BEVERAGE COMPANY INC.
DORI SUE LEWIS individually and a/n/f of A.N.B. and D.L.B. minor children
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/22/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/22/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/22/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
04/11/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate date of a process | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive mandate date. | | |
04/11/1997 | Mandate issued | 940 SW2d 83 | | |
02/28/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | application granted pursuant to Rule 170, TRAP | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
02/28/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | application granted pursuant to Rule 170, TRAP | Pursuant to Rule 170, T.R.A.P., the application for writ of error is granted and w/o hearing OA, the judgment of the COA is rev'd and judgment is rendered | |
02/28/1997 | Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record | COA judgment reversed; Judgment Rendered | | |
02/28/1997 | Opinion issued | Court of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment rendered | Judgment of the COA is Reversed and Judgment is Rendered Per Curiam Opinion 940 SW2d 83 | |
06/12/1996 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
05/22/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/11/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 2A1 Opinion Issued; no Rehearing filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
D.L.B. (MINOR) | Respondent | Mr. B. Buzz Deitchmann |
7-11 BEVERAGE COMPANY, INC. | Petitioner | Mr. Alan B. Daughtry |
LEWIS, DORI SUE | Respondent | Mr. B. Buzz Deitchmann |
A.N.B. (MINOR) | Respondent | Mr. B. Buzz Deitchmann |
THE SOUTHLAND CORPORATION | Petitioner | Mr. J. Mark Penley |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-95-00095-CV
Reversed & Remanded
944 SW2d 001, 02-08-96
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable DIXON W. HOLMAN
Trial Court Information
67th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable George A. Crowley
67-157276-95