judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WAYNE P. GREEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1408
Short Caption:WAYNE P. GREEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12443-86Filed Date:10/27/1988

Opening Event Date:10/27/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/21/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/17/1990
Argued/Submitted:04/10/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/11/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWayne P. Green N
Mindy A. DanielsNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
David Carey WollYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GREEN, WAYNE P. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/21/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 01 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 02 VACATE APPMT OF MINDY A. NOTE - 02 DANIELS & APPT DAVID C. WOLL NOTE - 03 FOR APLT; BRF OF APLT DUE IN NOTE - 03 40 DAYS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/04/10 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - WOLLD FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BLACKMONL FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 DANIELSM VACATED 6/21/89.
10/27/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MINDY A. DANIELS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD DSA
05/12/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/12/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (539 PGS RT - FINNERIN) GT PANEL SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD R
06/19/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 062189 SCHPRD BA
06/21/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/21/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID CAREY WOLL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 061989 SCHPRD GG
07/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/6/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD BA
08/03/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/6/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD V
09/05/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/2/89 (NO OPPO) GG PANEL SCDATE 090689 SCHPRD BA
09/21/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE BRF ON OR BEFORE 10/2/89 (NFX) SL PANELRBH SCDATE 090689 SCHPRD N
09/29/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD BA
10/26/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-1-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 110389 SCHPRD BE
11/13/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLE'S BR TO AND INC. 12/1/89. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 2, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 120189 SCHPRD BE
12/08/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/2/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD CHECK
12/29/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 9, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD BE
01/09/1990RECEIVED APPELLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990FiledBriefing Completed
01/17/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD V
04/10/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/10/1990ARGUED PANELFESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/11/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID CAREY WOLL, ESQ. (PETITION FOR CERT.) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1990NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN SUPREME COURT ON 7-10-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1990NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIIN SUPREME COURT (90-5254) FILED 7/18/90 GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD