judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KENNETH L. BANKS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1365
Short Caption:KENNETH L. BANKS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10927-86Filed Date:10/25/1988

Opening Event Date:10/25/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/22/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/26/1991
Argued/Submitted:05/01/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/30/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKenneth L. Banks N
Marian Flynn YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Albert A. Herring YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BANKS, KENNETH L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 88-1366,85-1360,85-1173, NOTE - 01 84-1197,84-1798 NOTE - 02 CON: 88-1366, 88-1367 NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 10/26/90 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 03 BY 12/17/90; BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 04 BY 01/22/91; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 04 02/11/91; SCHED CASE ON NOTE - 05 MARCH 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 01/07/91 ORD: CRT'S ADVANCED NOTE - 06 BRFG ORD OF 10/26/90, IS VAC; NOTE - 07 F/O GRANTG APLT MO TO EXT TM NOTE - 07 TO FL BRF TO 1/11/91, BRF OF NOTE - 08 APLE TO BE FL 2/15/91, & RBA NOTE - 08 TO BE FL 3/6/91; NOS 88-1365, NOTE - 09 88-1366,& 88-1367 TO BE SCHED NOTE - 09 ON MAY 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 10 1/18/91 ORD: 1/1/91 ORD IS NOTE - 10 VACATED; GRANT MO OF APLT TO NOTE - 11 EXT TM TO EXTENT THAT BRF OF NOTE - 11 APLT IS DUE 1/22/91; BRF OF NOTE - 12 APLE 2/26/91 & REPLY BRF OF NOTE - 12 APLT DUE 3/18/91; CASE REMAIN NOTE - 13 ON THE MAY 1991 CAL.; NFX. NOTE - 13
10/25/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/25/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARIAN FLYNN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1988ORDER SUA SPONTE, CON THIS APPEAL W/88-1366 & 88-1367 & SCHD BRF 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD. PB PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (258 PGS - GOAD)(SEE RECORD IN 88-1366 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 122688 SCHPRD R
03/22/1990FiledRecord Completed
10/26/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03 - 05 FOR ADVANCED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 091190 SCHPRD GR
12/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 45 DAYS (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 121790 SCHPRD BA
01/07/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 6 THRU 9. GW PANELRO SCDATE 122490 SCHPRD TO
01/10/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-31-91 AD PANEL SCDATE 011191 SCHPRD BA
01/18/1991ORDER SEE NOTEFIELDS 10-13. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BREIF A PANEL SCDATE 012291 SCHPRD BA
02/05/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/11/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/11/1991ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM FL LODGED BRF & LODGED BRF FLD. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 020691 SCHPRD GR
02/26/1991FiledBriefing Completed
02/26/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 022691 SCHPRD BE
05/01/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/01/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/06/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELRGWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/06/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/30/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD