judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KENNETH L. BANKS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1366
Short Caption:KENNETH L. BANKS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4335-87Filed Date:10/25/1988

Opening Event Date:10/25/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/22/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/26/1991
Argued/Submitted:05/01/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/30/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKenneth L. Banks N
Marian Flynn YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Albert A. Herring YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BANKS, KENNETH L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 SEE 88-1365,85-1360,85-1173, NOTE - 01 84-1197,84-1798 NOTE - 02 CON 88-1365, 88-1367 NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 10/26/90 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 03 BY 12/17/90; BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 04 DUE BY 01/22/91; REPLY BRF DUE NOTE - 04 BY 02/11/91; SCHED CASE ON NOTE - 05 MARCH 1991 CAL; NFX NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 01/07/91 ORD: CRT'S ADVANCED NOTE - 06 BRF ORD OF 10/26/90, IS VAC; NOTE - 07 BRF OF APLT TO BE FL 1/11/91; NOTE - 07 BRF OF APLE TO BE FL 2/15/91;& NOTE - 08 RBA DUE TO BE FILED 3/6/91;F/O NOTE - 08 THAT NOS 88-1365, 88-1366,& NOTE - 09 88-1367 TO BE SCHED ON MAY 91, NOTE - 09 CALENDAR, NFX. NOTE - 10 1/18/91 ORD: BRFG ORD IS VA- NOTE - 10 CATED; GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT NOTE - 11 TM TO EXTENT THAT BRF OF APLT NOTE - 11 IS DUE 1/22/91; BRF OF APLE IS NOTE - 12 DUE 2/26/91 & REPLY BRF OF NOTE - 12 APLT 3/18/91; CASE TO REMAIN NOTE - 13 SCHED ON MAY CAL; NFX. NOTE - 13
10/25/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/25/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARIAN FLYNN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1988ORDER SUA SPONTE, CON THIS APPEAL W/88-1365 & 88-1367 & SCHD BRF 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD. PB PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (258 PGS RT - GOAD) GT PANEL SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD R
03/22/1990FiledRecord Completed
10/26/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03 - 05 FOR ADVANCED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 091190 SCHPRD GR
12/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 45 DAYS (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 121790 SCHPRD BA
01/07/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 6 THRU 9. GW PANELRO SCDATE 102690 SCHPRD CHECK
01/10/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-31-91 AD PANEL SCDATE 011191 SCHPRD MXBA
01/19/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 10-13. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 012291 SCHPRD BA
02/05/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/11/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/11/1991ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM FL LODGED BRF & LODGED BRF FLD. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 020691 SCHPRD GR
02/26/1991FiledBriefing Completed
02/26/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 022691 SCHPRD BE
05/01/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/01/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/06/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELRGWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/06/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/30/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD