judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TERRY LEE BENSTINE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-176)
Case Number:06-176Case Docketed On:07/28/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:TERRY LEE BENSTINE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TERRY LEE BENSTINE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTerry Lee BenstineKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/28/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/28/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/28/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/14/2006Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
09/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/15/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/17/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver (faxed)MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
10/18/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/18/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/19/2006Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal (original)Notice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal
12/26/2006Correspondence - Incoming addressed to Chief Justice Voigt from appellant regarding proving his innocenceCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
12/26/2006Correspondence - Outgoing, regarding appellant's waiver of appeal and voluntary dismissalCorrespondenceOutgoingFinal