judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL J. SINDRAM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0913
Short Caption:MICHAEL J. SINDRAM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD3158-08Filed Date:07/22/2010

Opening Event Date:07/22/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/02/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael Sindram Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/12/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed as appellant is not aggrieved by the July 13, 2010 since the criminal case against him has been dismissed. In Re: C.T., 724 A.2d 590 (DC 1999); OR for having been UNTIMELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
08/12/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC - motion for appointment of counsel
08/23/2010APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE and Motion for Appointment of Counsel.
10/20/2010 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED for lack of standing. See In re Estate of Delaney, 819 A.2d 968, 1003 (DC 2003);... It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APOINTMENT OF COUNSEL and ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND IS DENIED AS MOOT. (GLPRTE) (jl)
10/20/2010DISMISSED
11/03/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (Titled as: Motion for Clarication and Modification of Order and for related relief))
11/09/2010TMC - motion for reconsideration
11/24/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION and MODIFICATION of order IS DENIED. (GLPRTE) (jl)
12/02/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived