Case: 10-07-00092-CR
10-07-00092-CR
03/29/2007
Aggravated Robbery
Tony Swinnie
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/07/2008 | Case stored | | |
10/07/2008 | Mandate issued | | |
09/17/2008 | Case returned from higher court | | |
08/20/2008 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | |
04/28/2008 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |
04/21/2008 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |
03/24/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Grant motion | |
02/20/2008 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |
02/20/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/23/2008 | Submitted | | |
01/02/2008 | Case advanced without oral argument | | |
12/04/2007 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/04/2007 | Brief filed, oral argument requested | | |
11/08/2007 | Brief filed, oral argument requested | | |
11/06/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/05/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief | | |
10/09/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/03/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief | | |
09/11/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/06/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief | | |
07/31/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/25/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief | | |
07/03/2007 | Reporter's Record filed | | |
05/21/2007 | Clerk's Record filed | | |
03/29/2007 | Docketing Statement filed | | |
03/29/2007 | Notice of Appeal Filed - Criminal Case | | |
03/21/2007 | Trial court judgment | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/08/2108 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Swinnie, Tony Wayne | Appellant | Walter M. Reaves Jr. |
Texas, The State of | Criminal - State of Texas | John W. Segrest Christy Barber |
Trial Court Information
19th District Court
McLennan
Honorable Ralph T. Strother
2006-1391-C
life