judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GALLONI VS. DIRECTOR, HUMAN RESOURCES

Case Information: 38128
Short Caption:GALLONI VS. DIRECTOR, HUMAN RESOURCESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee waived-09/05/03 order fn4.
07/06/2001Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petititon for Peremptory Writ of Mandamus and Motion for Order to Show Cause. 01-11363
08/22/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Petitioners shall have 15 days from the date of this order in which to provide this court with a proper proof of service of the petition and their affidavits. We caution petitioners that failure to comply with this order may result in the denial of their petition. 01-14222
10/03/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. fn1[On August 22, 2001, we directed petitioners to provide this court with proofs of service of the petition and their affidavits upon respondents. We determine that the proper person document received on August 29, 2001, demonstrates compliance with our order. We direct the clerk to file the document received on August 29, 2001. We defer our consideration of all other proper person documents or requests received from petitioners to day.] 01-16638
10/03/2001Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Compliance to Order filed 8/22/01; proof of service of petition & affidavit. 01-14645
11/01/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 01-18306
09/05/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Mandamus. "We deny the petition." fn4[Although petitioners have not been granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from them and conclude that relief is not warranted. We waive the filing fee. See NRAP 21(e). NNP04S-NB/MS/MG 03-14898
09/15/2003Other Returned Mail. Order filed 09/05/03 addressed to Douglas Morgan and James Hedrick returned-Paroled or Discharged. No forwarding address.
09/30/2003RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 03-14909
09/30/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.