judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TAMMY RANAE KAISER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-177)
Case Number:06-177Case Docketed On:07/31/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:TAMMY RANAE KAISER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TAMMY RANAE KAISER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTammy Ranae KaiserKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/31/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/31/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/31/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/15/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/18/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/31/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/01/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/15/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver (faxed)MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
12/19/2006Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal (original)Notice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal
12/19/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
12/19/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal