judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN A. HALL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0914
Short Caption:KEVIN A. HALL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Lead: 09-CM-0682 Consolidated:10-CO-0914
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM649-09Filed Date:07/16/2010

Opening Event Date:07/16/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/22/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevin A. Hall Y
Jeffrey L. LightNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/16/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/10/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 09-CM-682 and 10-CO-914 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Jeffrey LIght, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 10-CO-914. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall prepare and transmit the record index and record copies in appeal no. 10-CO-914 to this court fothwith. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's consolidated brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, adn the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: ETW)
08/10/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Jeffrey Light, Esquire
08/11/2010RECORD INDEX (10CO914)
08/11/2010RECORD COPIES (10CO914)
09/09/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
09/09/2010APPENDIX - attached to Appellant's Brief
10/14/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/18/2010TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief/appdx
01/31/2011on consideration of appellee's motion for summary affirmance, appellant's brief and the record on appeal, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted. SEE ORDER FO judgment of conviction and order on appeal are affirmed. (RZFIKG)
01/31/2011AFFIRMED
02/14/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
02/22/2011MANDATE ISSUED