Case: 10-0990
10-0990
12/06/2010
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
LARRY C. NAIL
RICK GODWIN AND EAGLE'S NEST CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP CHURCH, INC., NOW KNOWN AS SUMMIT CHRISTIAN CENTER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/16/2011 | Reply Brief | Petitioner | E-FILED Petitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Larry C. Nail. (HARD COPIES REC'D) | |
06/01/2011 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | E-FILED: Respondents' Brief on the Merits on behalf of Rick Godwin, et al. (HARD COPIES RECEIVED) | |
04/11/2011 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | E-FILED: Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Larry C. Nail. (hard copies received) | |
02/16/2011 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | Reply to Response to Petition for Review. On behalf of Larry C. Nail. (12) | |
01/31/2011 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review. On behalf of Rick Godwin, et al. (12) | |
12/06/2010 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | attached to petition | |
12/06/2010 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of Larry Nail. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/26/2011 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | Record returned to the Court of Appeals | | |
10/24/2011 | Case Stored | Row 19 G-5 | | |
10/19/2011 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Certified copy of notice sent to the Court of Appeals | | |
08/19/2011 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied with Justice not sitting. | | |
07/05/2011 | Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates | Petitioner Larry Nail's lead counsel, Ms. Cindy Olson Bourland will be on vacation from Aug 2 - 15, 2011. (1) | | |
06/16/2011 | Reply Brief | E-FILED Petitioner's Brief on the Merits. On behalf of Larry C. Nail. (HARD COPIES REC'D) | ||
06/01/2011 | Brief on the Merits | E-FILED: Respondents' Brief on the Merits on behalf of Rick Godwin, et al. (HARD COPIES RECEIVED) | ||
04/28/2011 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Unopposed motion for extension of time to file brief on the merits granted. Respondent's brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 6/1/11; Reply brief due 6/16/11; mailbox rule does not apply. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. | |
04/25/2011 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | E-FILED Unopposed motion for extension of time to file brief (2) filed on behalf of Rick Godwin, et al. HARD COPIES RECEIVED | | |
04/14/2011 | Case Record Filed | Inventory in main remarks | | |
04/11/2011 | Brief on the Merits | E-FILED: Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Larry C. Nail. (hard copies received) | ||
03/11/2011 | Record Requested in Petition for Review | | | |
03/10/2011 | Brief on the Merits Requested | Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 4/11/11; Response brief due 5/2/11; Reply brief due 5/17/11; mailbox rule does not apply | ||
02/16/2011 | Reply to Response | Reply to Response to Petition for Review. On behalf of Larry C. Nail. (12) | ||
01/31/2011 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review. On behalf of Rick Godwin, et al. (12) | ||
01/31/2011 | Address Change | Respondents, Rick Godwin, et al. notifies the Court that Laura Cavaretta will be affiliated with the firm Cavarretta, Katona & Francis PLLC. and request that the Court deliver all correspondences to this firm. Updated in CMS. (1) | | |
01/07/2011 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for review due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 2/7/11; mailbox rule does not apply | ||
12/14/2010 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
12/08/2010 | Response Waiver filed | Response waiver to petition for review filed on behalf of Rick Godwin, et al. (orig & 2) | | |
12/06/2010 | Appendix Filed | attached to petition | | |
12/06/2010 | Petition for Review | Petition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of Larry Nail. |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
10/24/2011 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Row 19 G-5 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Nail, Larry C. | Petitioner | Ms. Cindy Olson Bourland Mr. Gary L. Richardson Ms. Anna Lauren Eby Mr. J. Bruce Bennett |
Godwin, Rick | Respondent | Mr. Nathan Andrew Ketterling Mr. Jonathan D. Pauerstein Ms. Laura A. Cavaretta Mr. Jerry A. Gibson |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-10-00193-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
___ SW3d ___, 10-20-10
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable Phylis J. Speedlin
Trial Court Information
225th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Barbara H. Nellermoe
2008-CI-08066