Case: 02-89-00173-CR
02-89-00173-CR
06/30/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Brown, Samuel Powell
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/07/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/08/1991 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | Refused | |
02/25/1991 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | | |
01/23/1991 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
12/27/1990 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
12/12/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/29/1990 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
10/17/1990 | Submitted | | |
10/17/1990 | Submission | | |
10/08/1990 | Order Entered | | |
09/13/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
09/13/1990 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/12/1990 | Motion Filed | | |
05/17/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
04/17/1990 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/17/1990 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
03/26/1990 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/26/1990 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
03/01/1990 | Submission | | |
02/28/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
01/29/1990 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/29/1990 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
01/02/1990 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/28/1989 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
11/27/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
10/31/1989 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/31/1989 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/31/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
10/31/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
10/30/1989 | Motion Filed | | |
10/30/1989 | Motion Filed | | |
10/25/1989 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/24/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
08/11/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
06/30/1989 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
06/30/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/07/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Brown, Samuel Powell | Criminal - Appellant | |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas |
Trial Court Information
30th District Court
Wichita
Honorable Robert P. Brotherton
26,418-A
Life, TDC & $10,000 fine