judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CROSBY BOLDEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0717
Short Caption:CROSBY BOLDEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M1474-89Filed Date:06/22/1989

Opening Event Date:06/22/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/28/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/11/1991
Argued/Submitted:01/16/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/27/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCrosby Bolden N
Mark L. GoldstoneYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
G. Bradley Weinsheimer YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BOLDEN, CROSBY UNITED STATES
06/22/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/29/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD R
08/17/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARK L. GOLDSTONE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 082889 SCHPRD CHECK
09/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (157 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 121289 SCHPRD RT
11/28/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 146-PGS (GLEASON) AJ PANEL SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD RT
11/28/1989RECORD COMPLETED
09/18/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLANT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT (40) DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 102990 SCHPRD BA
11/14/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APLT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DYS FROM DATE OF ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 102590 SCHPRD U
12/24/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF ENTIRE TRANSCRIPT NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 122490 SCHPRD BA
07/02/1991ORDER APLT TO ADVISE CT W/SPECIFICIT OF WHAT RT IS OUTSTANDING W/IN 10 DAYS. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 070191 SCHPRD K
07/12/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY TO JULY 2, 1991 AJ PANEL SCDATE 071291 SCHPRD STATE
07/19/1991ORDER BA DUE 9/6/91, BE DUE 10/11/91 RBA DUE 10/30/91. SCHD ON JAN 1992 CAL. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 071591 SCHPRD K
09/05/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR ONE DAY EXTENSION (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 090691 SCHPRD BA
09/09/1991RECEIVED APLT BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLT EXT TM FL BRF, LODGED BRIEF FLD. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PR PANEL SCDATE 101191 SCHPRD BE
10/11/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/16/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/16/1992SUBMITTED PANELRGTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1992AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/27/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD