judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC D. BAILEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0972
Short Caption:ERIC D. BAILEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6672-86Filed Date:08/19/1987

Opening Event Date:08/19/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/01/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Peter N. MannNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Paul J. RileyNN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BAILEY, ERIC D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 10/19/87 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 01 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D, APPMT NOTE - 02 OF PETER N. MANN W/D & PAUL J. NOTE - 02 RILEY APPTD TO REPRESENT APLT NOTE - 03 ON APPEAL; NEW COUNSEL FOR NOTE - 03 APLT TO FL STATE IN 20 DAYS NOTE - 04 INDICATING WHETHER ADDT'L RT NOTE - 04 WILL BR ORDERED FOR APPEAL.
01/01/1906 MANNP WITHDRAWN 10/19/87.
08/19/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER N. MANN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1987COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF PETER N. MANN AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (133 PGS - SCHOCH) PB PANEL SCDATE 101987 SCHPRD R
10/19/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PAUL J. RILEY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD CHECK
12/03/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 103187 SCHPRD RT
01/27/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE APLT BR OR VACATE APNTMNT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 011288 SCHPRD BA
02/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS RECEIVED & FOR A DISCHARGE OF OTSC 1/27/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD BA
03/01/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO EXTENT THAT APLT BR IS DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 022488 SCHPRD M
08/10/1988ORDER CT RPTR TO FILE 5/27-5/29/87 RT W/IN 30 DAYS ABSO-NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 030188 SCHPRD RT
09/28/1988ORDER REFER CT RPTR (SIMMS) TO TR CT FOR OTSC WHY SHE SHLD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT OF COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(176 PGS/SIMMS) AD PANEL SCDATE 120188 SCHPRD CHECK
10/17/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 28TH JB PANEL SCDATE 112588 SCHPRD BA
12/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
01/10/1989ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
02/01/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD