judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREGORY A. FLETCHER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1016
Short Caption:GREGORY A. FLETCHER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1322-85Filed Date:08/28/1987

Opening Event Date:08/28/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/17/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/07/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/11/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/01/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGregory A. Fletcher N
Thomas T. HeslepYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FLETCHER, GREGORY A. UNITED STATES
08/28/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS T. HESLEP, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 102787 SCHPRD R
10/21/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT PB PANEL SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD DSA
10/22/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD CHECK
11/12/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/17/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (36 PGS RT - BRADLEY) GT PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD RT
09/26/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/24/88 (NO OPE) MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD BA
11/15/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 102488 SCHPRD BA
11/16/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO LV TO FL BRF, CLK TO FL BRF, APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELRO SCDATE 120688 SCHPRD V
12/15/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE (APPELLEE) JB PANEL SCDATE 011389 SCHPRD BE
07/07/1989ORDER DENY MO OF APLE FOR SUMM AFFIRM; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELMKSC SCDATE 032489 SCHPRD TMC
08/07/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/07/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD BE
01/11/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/11/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGNWST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1990AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF TRIAL COURT JDGMT PANELRGNWST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE 569 A.2d 597
02/07/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 0253
03/01/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD