judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TROY V. MEADERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1015
Short Caption:TROY V. MEADERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7270-83Filed Date:08/31/1987

Opening Event Date:08/31/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/02/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/15/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/23/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/15/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTroy V. Meaders N
Barbara E. SosnickYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Ronald C. Crump YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MEADERS, TROY V. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/9/88 ORD GRT APLE MO FO EXT NOTE - 01 OF TM TO FL BRF TO 12/15/88 NOTE - 02 & ANY FURTHER REQUEST FO AN NOTE - 02 EXT OF TM WILL BE LOOKED UPON NOTE - 03 WITH DISFAVOR AND GRT ONLY IN NOTE - 03 EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES.
08/31/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BARBARA E. SOSNICK, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 103087 SCHPRD R
10/30/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD DSA
11/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD DSA
08/09/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 13, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 091388 SCHPRD BE
10/12/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/15/88 MLR PANEL SCDATE 101388 SCHPRD BE
11/02/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/04/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/15/88; NFX. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 110288 SCHPRD V
11/15/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 15, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 111588 SCHPRD BE
12/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 1-3 PB PANELRO SCDATE 120688 SCHPRD V
12/15/1988FiledBriefing Completed
12/15/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF AND APPENDIX AD PANEL SCDATE 121588 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(12 PGS/SALAZAR) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/23/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/15/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD