judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DORAN (JEREMY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38110
Short Caption:DORAN (JEREMY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lincoln Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR0203001Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/29/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-11086
07/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of judgment of conviction (jury trial) appealed from filed in district court on: July 3, 2001. 01-11525
08/07/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 5 & 6, 2001. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. 01-13286
08/09/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-13507
08/09/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-13508
08/17/2001MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. 01-14023
08/20/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-14085
08/24/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. State's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. 01-14391
08/27/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Service to Leo Flangas of State's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal). 01-14449
09/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn3[On August 17, 2001, appellant filed a motion for a stay, pending this appeal. On August 24, 2001, the State filed an opposition to the motion. The motion is denied as moot.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-15420
10/09/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-15690
10/09/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/19/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 11, 2001. 01-15690