judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PERCY MOORMAN V. U.S. BANK, N.A.

Case Information: 10-CV-0901
Short Caption:PERCY MOORMAN V. U.S. BANK, N.A.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB6742-10Filed Date:07/22/2010

Opening Event Date:07/22/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/25/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/09/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/23/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPercy Moorman YPro SeN
AppelleeU.S. Bank, N.A.As Trustee for Adjustable rate mortgage 2005-3, adjustable rate mortgage backed pass through certificate, series 2005-3N
Matthew M. MooreYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/26/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY
07/27/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's motion to stay (emergency)
07/29/2010TMC - appellant's motion for stay - oppo
07/30/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED. See Barry v. Washington Post Co., 529 A.2d 319, 321 (DC 1987)... It is *****MORE*****
07/30/2010 F/ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (GLOBKN) (rm)
08/03/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file motion for appeal transcript
08/03/2010RECEIVED - aplt's motion for appeal transcript
08/10/2010APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD w/documents attached
08/31/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion to supplement the record, to which no opposition has been filed, and it appearing that the record on appeal has not yet been filed with this court, and this court only reviews documents submitted to the trial court at the time the order on appeal was entered, and appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged motion for appeal transcript, to which no opposition has been filed, and it appearing that transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that the motion to supplement the record is denied. See D.C. App. R. 10 (a); Cobb v. Standard Drug Co., 453 A.2d 110, 112 (D.C. 1982). It is (MORE)
08/31/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged motion for appeal transcript is granted. It is (MORE)
08/31/2010RECEIVED - (MOTION FOR APPEAL TRANSCRIPT) (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED for 3/24/10, 5/14/10 & 6/4/10)
08/31/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index, record copies and transcripts in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (ETW) elp
09/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (8-pgs/tape 3/24/10 proc.)
09/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (18-pgs/tape 5/14/10 proc.)
09/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (21-pgs/tape 6/4/10 proc.) proc.)w/cd attached
09/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/22/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
09/23/2010RECORD COPIES
09/23/2010RECORD INDEX
11/03/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 22, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief and the limited appendix, as required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
11/23/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (*opp) (elp)
12/03/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's motion for exention of time to file brief
12/09/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the limited appendix, and the opposition thereto, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 22, 2011. (ETW) elp
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/appendix attached
02/22/2011APPENDIX
03/29/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 4/19/11
04/22/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and it appearing that appellee's brief was not lodged with this court on or before April 19, 2011, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted to the extent that appellee's brief shall be filed within 15 days from the date of this order. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
04/25/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/25/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
07/14/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/07/2011FiledMotion for declaratory judgment (Appellant)
11/09/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Wagner, King, Nebeker
11/14/2011FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion for Declaratory Judgement.
11/29/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Wagner, King, Nebeker, Senior Judges.)
12/05/2011FiledMotion To Reconsider (Appellant)
01/13/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se motion for reconsideration
01/20/2012FiledMotion from aplt seeking clarification (Appellant)
01/23/2012FiledMandate
06/15/2012LodgedNotice Received second notice of fault and demand for payment (Appellant)
07/06/2012LodgedMotion for clarification (Appellant)
07/16/2012LodgedFinal Notice Received of Default and demand for payment (Appellant)
07/17/2012FiledLetter To Appellant returning the Motion for Clarification submitted on 7/6/12 by mail.
10/18/2012LodgedMotion for clarification (Appellant Moorman, Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A.)
10/26/2012LodgedMotion for clarification (Appellant)
11/06/2012FiledLetter To Appellant Moorman re: Motion for Clarification