judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GLENN MCCUTCHEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0973
Short Caption:GLENN MCCUTCHEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:87-CF-0973Consolidated: 87-CF-1156 , 88-CF-0328
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8176-86Filed Date:08/19/1987

Opening Event Date:08/19/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/01/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/23/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/15/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
William L. Peters YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Su Zann Lamb YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCCUTCHEN, GLENN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/1/87 ORD: GRANT MO TO W/D NOTE - 01 JAMES KLEIN & APPT WILLIAM NOTE - 02 L. PETERS TO REPRESENT APLT; NOTE - 02 FORMER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO NOTE - 03 TRANSMIT PAPERS TO NEW COUNSEL NOTE - 03 BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 04 1/20/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 04 TO REMAND REC TO TRL CRT FOR NOTE - 05 PURPOSES OF REDUCING APLT'S NOTE - 05 SENTENCE; CLK OF SUPER CRT TO NOTE - 06 TRANSMIT TO THIS CRT COPY OF NOTE - 06 ANY ORDERS PERTAINING TO MO NOTE - 07 TO REMAND AS SUPP REC. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 4/12/88 ORD: SS, CONS 87-973 NOTE - 08 & 88-328; WILLIAM L. PETERS NOTE - 09 APPTD TO REPRESENT APLT; APLT NOTE - 09 TO FL DSA IN 88-328 IN 10 DAYS NOTE - 10 CLK OF SUPER CRT TO TRANSMIT NOTE - 10 TRL CRT'S ORD OF 3/3/88 AS NOTE - 11 SUPP REC FORTHWITH. NOTE - 11 NOTE - 12 CON 87-1156 & 88-328 NOTE - 12 NOTE - 13 9/13/88- ORD GRT APLT'S MO FO NOTE - 13 LV TO FL LDG BRF IN 87-973 & NOTE - 14 88-328 AND GRT APLT'S MO FO NOTE - 14 EXT OF TM TO FL BRF IN 87-1156 NOTE - 15 TO 9/27/88. NOTE - 15
01/01/1906 PDS VACATED 12/1/87
08/19/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/31/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 091187 SCHPRD DSA
10/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RT - 179 PGS SWAGERTY) PB PANEL SCDATE 101987 SCHPRD R
11/18/1987COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM L. PETERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 111987 SCHPRD CHECK
12/16/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND JB MOTION FILED BY PAUL ZUKERBERG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/23/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND THE RECORD TO THE TRIAL COURT GG PANEL SCDATE 011888 SCHPRD BA
01/20/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-07. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 010588 SCHPRD DDW
04/12/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 08-11. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD CHECK
04/14/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT OF ATTY P. ZUCKERBERG FOR APLT IN 88-328 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (ORD OF JUDGE PRYOR DATED 4/12/88) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988ORDER SS, CON 87-1156 W/87-973 & 88- 328; FO: APLTS BRIEFS DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 051288 SCHPRD SR
08/23/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/27/88 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 082488 SCHPRD BA
08/25/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELD 13-15. PANEL SCDATE 090788 SCHPRD V
09/27/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-1156 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 23, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 102788 SCHPRD BE
11/01/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/23/1988FiledBriefing Completed
11/23/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 112388 SCHPRD BE
05/15/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/15/1989SUBMITTED PANELMKFEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELMKFEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD