judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALLEN FORD, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0974
Short Caption:ALLEN FORD, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6745-86Filed Date:08/10/1987

Opening Event Date:08/10/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/01/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/28/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/12/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/04/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAllen Ford, Jr.N
Joel F. Brenner NN
AppellantAllen Ford, Jr.N
Eugene M. Bond NN
AppellantAllen Ford, Jr.N
Daniel M. Schember NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Carolyn K. Kolben YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FORD JR., ALLEN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 2/12/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 01 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 02 VACATED APPMT OF JOEL F. NOTE - 02 BRENNER & APPT EUGENE M. BOND NOTE - 03 TO REPRESENT APLT; NEWLY APPTD NOTE - 03 COUNSEL TO FL STATE IN 20 DAYS NOTE - 04 OF STATUS OF RT. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 8/12/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 05 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 06 OF EUGENE M. BOND & APPT NOTE - 06 DANIEL M. SCHEMBER; NEWLY- NOTE - 07 APPTD COUNSEL TO INFORM CRT IN NOTE - 07 20 DAYS WHETHER A SUPP BRF NOTE - 08 WILL BE FILED. NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 110988 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 09 FOR LV TO FILE STATE & CLK TO NOTE - 10 FILE LDGD STATE; FO: GRANT NOTE - 10 APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE SUP NOTE - 11 BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS NOTE - 11 FILED W/THIS COURT; FO: GRANT NOTE - 12 APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO NOTE - 12 30 DAYS AFT SUP BR IS FILED. NOTE - 13 11/20/90 ORD: SS, THAT APPEALS NOTE - 13 NOS. 87-974 & 90-1380 ARE CONS NOTE - 14 F/O DANIEL M. SCHEMBER, ESQ., NOTE - 14 IS APPOINTD TO REPRESENT APLT NOTE - 15 HEREIN. F/O COUNS FOR APLT TO NOTE - 15 FL DSA IN NO. 90-1380 W/IN 30 NOTE - 16 DAYS. NOTE - 16 NOTE - 17 CONS: 90-1380 NOTE - 17 NOTE - 18 7/2/91 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 18 TO CALENDAR CASE TO EXTENT NOTE - 19 THAT THE BRFS FL IN THIS CASE NOTE - 19 SHALL BE DEEMED THE BRFS IN NOTE - 20 90-1380; THE CLK TO SCHED CASE NOTE - 20 AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS.
01/01/1906 BRENNERJ VACATED 2/12/88. BONDE VACATED 8/12/88.
08/10/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOEL F. BRENNER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/23/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 092487 SCHPRD DSA
10/01/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 100987 SCHPRD R
10/22/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (DUPLICATE RECORD BY ATTY) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/03/1987LETTER TO APLT RE APPTMT OF NEW COUNSEL SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1987RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, RE COURT-APPPOINTED ATTORNEY MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(46 PGS. -- PIRFO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (164 PGS. -- BURNS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 010988 SCHPRD RT
12/22/1987LETTER TO APLT RE TRANSCRIPTS SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (5 PGS - RAMOS) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) EUGENE M. BOND, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 020488 SCHPRD GG
02/22/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S 2/12/88 ORDER RE: STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 030288 SCHPRD STATE
03/10/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (145 PGS. -- SWARINGER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032588 SCHPRD RT
03/30/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 123187 SCHPRD RT
05/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 9, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 050988 SCHPRD BA
05/11/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT BRF TO BE FL BY 6/6/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 050588 SCHPRD V
05/31/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF & LIST PER RULE 30 MLH PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD BA
06/06/1988RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1988RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1988RECEIVED LETTER FROM COUNSEL FOR APLT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 5, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 070588 SCHPRD BE
07/07/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988RECEIVED LETTER FROM APLT'S COUNSEL RE: VISIT TO CLIENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD ANSA
07/29/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE LETTER TO COUNSEL RE STATUS OF CASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (EUGENE M. BOND) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 7, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 080588 SCHPRD BE
08/12/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DANIEL M. SCHEMBER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-08. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 080588 SCHPRD GG
08/29/1988APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSETO AUGUST 12TH ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 21ST JB PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD ANSA
09/06/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 11, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT PER 8/12/88 ORDER GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO SUSPEND SUPP. BRIEFING SCHD PENDING RECEIPT OF SENTENCING TRANSCRIPT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLE TO HOLD BRIEFING SCHEDULE IN ABEYANCE PENDING FILING OF SMA (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 09 - 12. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 092988 SCHPRD V
11/09/1988STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO 8/12/88 ORDER. EBP PANEL SCDATE 101088 SCHPRD OPE
07/13/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM SIMMS - 7/15/87 PROCEEDING JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (9 PGS - GOAD) GT PANEL SCDATE 122589 SCHPRD RT
08/11/1989RECEIVED PRO SE LTR FROM APLT TO COURT REPORTERS DIVISION RE: SENTEN- CING TRANSCRIPT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (11 PGS - DAVIS) JB PANEL SCDATE 022889 SCHPRD RT
01/05/1990STATEMENT OF APLT RE 8-12-89 ORDER AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/26/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLEE DUE IN 30 DAYS. CWC PANELRBH SCDATE 011190 SCHPRD U
02/23/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 28,1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 022690 SCHPRD BE
03/05/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (AMENDED) TO MARCH 28, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/28/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 032090 SCHPRD K
03/28/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/28/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 032890 SCHPRD BE
06/08/1990RECEIVED COPY OF NOTICE OF FILING POST- CONVICTION MOTION IN SUPERIOR COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1990ORDER CASE STAYED PENDING DISP OF 23-110 MO IN TRL CRT. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 032890 SCHPRD READY
11/20/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 13 THRU 16. GW PANELRO SCDATE 080690 SCHPRD CHECK
11/27/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 113089 SCHPRD DSA
02/26/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO CALENDAR APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/02/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 18-20. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 030591 SCHPRD TO
09/12/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/12/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGSTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/04/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD