judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDRE D. CLEA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0996
Short Caption:ANDRE D. CLEA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead: 87-CF-0971 Consolidated:87-CF-0996
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7854-86Filed Date:08/19/1987

Opening Event Date:08/19/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/06/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAndre D. Clea N
Gerald I. Fisher NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CLEA, ANDRE D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 87-971 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 6/1/88 ORD: DENY APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 02 WITHDRAW W/O PREJUDICE TO THE NOTE - 03 FILING BY APLT W/I 20 DAYS OF NOTE - 03 A STMT IN ACCORD. WITH JOHNSON NOTE - 04 V. UNITED STATES, 513 A.2D 798 NOTE - 04 (D.C. 1986). NOTE - 05 7/5/88 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 05 EXT TM TO FILE MO TO WITHDRAW NOTE - 06 APPEAL AND APLT W/I 20 DAYS TO NOTE - 06 FILE A STMT IN ACCORDANCE WITH NOTE - 07 JOHNSON V. U.S., 513 A.2D 798 NOTE - 07 (D.C. 1986).
08/19/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/29/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD DSA
09/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GERALD I. FISHER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (14 PGS RT-MAJORS) MLH PANEL SCDATE 101987 SCHPRD R
10/20/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1987ORDER NOS. 87-971 & 87-996 CONS; APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT HAS BEEN FILED W/THIS CT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 110387 SCHPRD BA
12/11/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (12 PGS - SALAZAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD RT
02/25/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (9 PGS. GRAYBILL) EBP PANEL SCDATE 103187 SCHPRD RT
05/02/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE APLT BR OR VACATE APPNTMT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 040588 SCHPRD BA
05/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 051288 SCHPRD BA
05/06/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO MAY 2ND COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 4 SL PANELPY SCDATE 050588 SCHPRD N
06/21/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEAL (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 062188 SCHPRD STATE
07/05/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 7 SL PANELPY SCDATE 062488 SCHPRD N
07/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD STATE
08/01/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
08/01/1988ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELPY SCDATE 072288 SCHPRD V
08/01/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
12/06/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD