judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NAPOLEON RICHARDSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-1064
Short Caption:NAPOLEON RICHARDSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M4755-89Filed Date:08/10/1989

Opening Event Date:08/10/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/06/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/16/1990
Argued/Submitted:06/12/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNapoleon Richardson N
Alan H. Bergstein YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
George J. Lane YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RICHARDSON, NAPOLEON UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 HEREBY FILED. FO THAT THIS NOTE - 01 APPEAL SHALL BE SCH FOR CON NOTE - 02 BEFORE A MERITS DIV. AS SOON NOTE - 02 AS THE BIZ OF THE CT. PERMITS.
08/10/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALAN BERGSTEIN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 091889 SCHPRD DSA
10/06/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (234 PGS/MOLLICHELLI) AD PANEL SCDATE 100989 SCHPRD R
11/08/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 111589 SCHPRD BA
11/15/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (34 PGS. -- HAWKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD JACKET ENTRY PAGE 4 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989ORDER APLT'S BRIEF SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AND APPENDIX AD PANEL SCDATE 010790 SCHPRD BA
02/12/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-8-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD BE
03/08/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-9-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990RECEIVED OF APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/16/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FL BRF AND THE LODGED BRF IS SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 2 JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/12/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGNWFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF SUPERIOR COURT JUDGMENT PANELRGNWFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE