judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES MARROW JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-1034
Short Caption:JAMES MARROW JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M1300-89Filed Date:08/24/1989

Opening Event Date:08/24/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/03/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/12/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/11/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/09/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames Marrow, Jr.N
Richard E. HollidayYN
AppellantJohn Doe N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Nancy J. Woodward YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MARROW JR., JAMES UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 111589 ORD: APLT'S MO FOR NOTE - 01 SUM REV DENIED; F/O APLE'S MO NOTE - 02 FOR SUM AFFIRM DENIED; F/O NOTE - 02 APLT TO TAKE STEPS TO HAVE NOTE - 03 RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. NOTE - 03
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/09/11 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HOLLIDAYR FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FISHERJ FOR - APPELLEE
08/24/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/24/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER MATTER TO THE FAMILY DIVISION RJG PANEL SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD R
08/29/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD E. HOLLIDAY, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE (APPELLEE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. MEH PANELNWTESC SCDATE 110389 SCHPRD VS
12/21/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 121589 SCHPRD R
01/03/1990FiledRecord Completed
01/03/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(9 PGS/SIMMS) AD PANEL SCDATE 013090 SCHPRD RT
03/13/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 11,1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 012090 SCHPRD BE
04/09/1990ORDER GRT APLE'S MO FOR X TM TO FILE BRF IS EXTENDED TO & INCLUDING 4/11/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 040390 SCHPRD B
04/11/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 041190 SCHPRD BE
05/07/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF APLE'S CORRECTED COPY AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/07/1990RECEIVED APLE'S BRIEF (APPENDIX) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/12/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF CORRECTED COPY JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO LV TO FL LODGED CORRECTED COPY OF APLE'S BRIEF JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD B
09/11/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/11/1990ARGUED PANELRGFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1990AMICUS CURIAE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1990RECEIVED AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1990AMICUS CURIAE'S BRIEF PDS BRF FILED IN 89-1278 DEEMED AMICUS BRF. MEH PANEL SCDATE 092590 SCHPRD OPE
09/19/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO CONSID BRF OF PDS IN 89-1278 AS AMICUS BRF IS GRANTED. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 091490 SCHPRD VS
11/19/1990AMICUS CURIAE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1990RECEIVED BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1990ORDER GRANT PDS' MOT TO CONSIDER REPLY BRF AS AMICUS SUBMISSION MEH PANELROFETE SCDATE 112090 SCHPRD VS
06/13/1991AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART JUDGMENT AF TRIAL COURT THAT CRIM.DIV. HAS JURISDICTION/ CAUSE RM FOR TRIAL. PANELRGFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRM METH -OPN JUDGE -FE CITE 592 A.2d 1042
06/13/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 1678 OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 0000
07/09/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD