judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RUDOLPH HACK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0983
Short Caption:RUDOLPH HACK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F217-85Filed Date:08/21/1987

Opening Event Date:08/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/02/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRudolph Hack N
Michael H. Hoffman NN
AppellantRudolph Hack N
Peter N. MannNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HACK, RUDOLPH UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/19/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 01 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 02 VACATE APPMT OF MICHAEL H. NOTE - 02 GOFFMAN & APPT PETER N. MANN; NOTE - 03 BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 8/28/89 ORDER GRANT MOTION OF NOTE - 04 PETER N. MANN, ESQ TO WITHDRAW NOTE - 05 AS COUNSEL FOR APLT, FO APLT NOTE - 05 IS PERMITTED TO PROCEED ON NOTE - 06 APPEAL PRO SE, & BRF OF APLT NOTE - 06 SHALL BE FILED 40 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 07 THE COMPLETE RECORD INCLUDING NOTE - 07 TRANSCRIPT.
01/01/1906 HOFFMANM VACATED 12/19/88. MANNP VACATED 8/28/89
08/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL H. HOFFMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/24/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 092487 SCHPRD DSA
09/24/1987RECEIVED A COPY OF APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR TRANSCRIPT FILED IN THE SUPERIOR COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 102087 SCHPRD R
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(4 PGS. -- RHOADES) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (11 PGS - SIMMS) JB PANEL SCDATE 123087 SCHPRD RT
03/16/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (28 PGS. -- OLIVER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (4 PGS - TREMEL) GT PANEL SCDATE 061588 SCHPRD RT
12/12/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF MICHAEL H. HOFFMAN AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER N. MANN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 121488 SCHPRD GG
02/01/1989RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER OF APPELLANT FOR STATUS OF MO FOR LVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/03/1989ORDER DIRG BA BE FILED BY 2/13/89 OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APTMT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) (EX PARTE) GT PANEL SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD BA
02/23/1989LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT, RESPONSE DUE BY 3/24/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD X
03/03/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE PRO SE, TO 2/23/89 ANDERS LET- TER MLR PANEL SCDATE 032489 SCHPRD ANSA
05/04/1989RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF CASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/28/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 4-7 PB PANELMKFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1991ORDER APLT BRF DUE W/IN 40 DYS FRM DATE OF THIS ORD. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 052991 SCHPRD U
08/07/1991ORDER APLT TO FL BRF W/IN 20 OR CASE DISMISSED. AD PANELJAC SCDATE 073191 SCHPRD K
09/11/1991FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
09/11/1991ORDER CASE IS DISMISSED FOR APLT'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT'S 8/7/91 ORDER. AD PANELRO SCDATE 083091 SCHPRD K
09/11/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
10/02/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD