judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT L. LANDRUM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0970
Short Caption:ROBERT L. LANDRUM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3221-87Filed Date:08/18/1987

Opening Event Date:08/18/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/02/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/04/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/10/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/04/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert L. Landrum N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kevin A. Forder YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LANDRUM, ROBERT L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: GRATTON CRAFT NOTE - 01
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/11/10 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - DOWDM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FORDERK FOR - APPELLEE
08/18/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/07/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL J. DOWD, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 092487 SCHPRD DSA
10/02/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/02/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 101987 SCHPRD R
10/06/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD BA
11/13/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (215 PGS - SIMMS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD OPE
12/28/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 28TH (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 121887 SCHPRD BA
12/31/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/28/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD CHECK
01/28/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 012888 SCHPRD BA
03/02/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 4, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 030388 SCHPRD BE
04/04/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 4, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD BE
04/28/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 5/4/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 042288 SCHPRD V
05/04/1988FiledBriefing Completed
05/04/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 050488 SCHPRD BE
05/20/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 11/10/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 092188 SCHPRD OPE
11/10/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/10/1988ARGUED PANELRGMKTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1989ORDER CT RPTR TO PREPARE & FILE 6/26/87 RT W/IN 5 DAYS. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(20 PGS/SIMMS) AD PANEL SCDATE 030389 SCHPRD SR
06/20/1989REVERSED AND REMANDED JDGMT RV JDGMT OF CONVICTION/ CAUSE RM FOR A NEW TRIAL PANELRGMKTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -MK CITE 559 A.2d 1323
06/20/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - MK PAGE # - 1299
07/05/1989MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC TO AUGUST 4, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1989ORDER GRT APLE'S MOTION TO FILE PET AND PET FOR REH/REH EB DUE ON OR BEFORE 8/4/89 (NFX) SL PANELRO SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD OPA
07/31/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLEE INFORMING COURT THAT NO PET FOR REH/REH EB WILL BE FILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 081489 SCHPRD MRRB
08/04/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD