judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ARMELL A. GAINES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0994
Short Caption:ARMELL A. GAINES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:87-CF-0994Consolidated: 90-CO-0439
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1771-86Filed Date:08/24/1987

Opening Event Date:08/24/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/13/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/20/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/14/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/15/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantArmell A. Gaines N
Kenneth H. RosenauYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Cherry-Marie B. Rojas YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GAINES, ARMELL A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 1/12/90 ORD: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 01 TO FILE COPY OF 23-110 MO HE NOTE - 02 FILED IN TR CT WITH THIS CT NOTE - 02 W/IN 10 DAYS; PROCEEDINGS IN NOTE - 03 THIS CASE STAYED PENDING TRIAL NOTE - 03 COURT'S DISPOSITION OF THAT NOTE - 04 MOTION. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 5/14/90 ORD: 87-994 & 90-439 NOTE - 05 ARE CONS; KENNETH ROSENAU APPT NOTE - 06 FOR APLT IN 90-439; APLT TO FL NOTE - 06 DSA IN 90-439 IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 07 CON 90-439 NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 06/12/90 ORD: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 08 SHALL FL THE DSA IN NO. 90-439 NOTE - 09 W/IN 10 DAYS. FAILURE TO DO SO NOTE - 09 MAY RESULT IN HIS APPOINTMENT NOTE - 10 BEING VACATED & HIS NAME NOTE - 10 REMOVED FROM THE PANEL OF ATTY NOTE - 11 AUTHORIZED TO RECEIVE APPNMNTS NOTE - 11 UNDER THE CJA.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/02/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - ROSENAUK FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - DESTRURAC FOR - APPELLEE
08/24/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) KENNETH H. ROSENAU, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/13/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD DSA
10/13/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 102387 SCHPRD R
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(180 PGS. -- RUST) RJG PANEL SCDATE 103187 SCHPRD RT
12/08/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (4 PGS - SCHOCH) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (8 PGS - WHALEN) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (5 PGS - BREMEN) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (39 PGS - ALLISON) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (9 PGS - OLIVER) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (5 PGS - TREMEL) GT PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD RT
08/24/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (6 PGS - MITCHELL) ADD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (197 PGS. -- GRAYBILL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
07/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #9 (4 PGS RT - GRAYBILL) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR REFERRED TO BPR. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081589 SCHPRD BA
10/02/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 50 DAYS JB PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD BA
10/03/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM TREMEL - 1/27/89 PROCEEDING (PREVIOUSLY SUBMITTED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1989RECEIVED CT RPTR GRAYBILL CERTIFICATION OF 11/4/86 - 11/6/86 PROC. (RT PREVIOUSLY PREPARED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989RECEIVED CT RPTR MITCHELL CERTIFICATION OF 5/27/87 PROC. (DUPLICATE REQUEST) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 15 DAYS, TO FL STMT RE STATUS OF PENDING RT FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1989STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) RE 12-4-89 COURT ORDER AD PANEL SCDATE 121989 SCHPRD SRT
01/12/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 010390 SCHPRD Q
01/23/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER DATED 1/12/90 RE: 23-110 MOTION IN TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 012290 SCHPRD STATE
03/15/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE STMT W/IN 30 DAYS RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY AJ PANEL SCDATE 041690 SCHPRD ANSA
05/14/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05 & 06. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 08 THUR 11 GW PANELRO SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD V
06/20/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT (IN 90-439) AJ PANEL SCDATE 062290 SCHPRD DSA
08/17/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 081690 SCHPRD B
09/20/1990FiledBriefing Completed
09/20/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF APPENDICES AJ PANEL SCDATE 092190 SCHPRD BE
01/16/1991ORDER SS DIRECTING CASE TO BE ARGUED ON 2/14/91 AT 1:30 PM. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/14/1991ARGUED PANELRGTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/15/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD