judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD L. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0993
Short Caption:RICHARD L. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead: 87-CF-0934 Consolidated:87-CF-0993
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12733-86Filed Date:08/20/1987

Opening Event Date:08/20/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/26/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/21/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/08/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/22/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRichard L. Johnson N
Robert H. Haas NN
AppellantRichard L. Johnson N
Carl V. AngelisYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, RICHARD L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 011188 ORDER: SS, CONS 87-854, NOTE - 01 87-934, 87-993 & 87-1068; FO: NOTE - 02 BRIEFS OF APLTS DUE 40 DAYS NOTE - 02 AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS CT. NOTE - 03 CON: 87-934 NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 10/19/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 04 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 05 VACATE APPMT OF ROBERT H. HAAS NOTE - 05 & CLK TO ENTR APPRNC OF CARL NOTE - 06 V. ANGELIS AS RETAINED COUNSL; NOTE - 06 GRANT MO OF APLT IN 87-1068 NOTE - 07 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/18; NOTE - 07 BRF OF APLT IN THIS CASE DUE NOTE - 08 IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 08 NOTE - 11 3/1/89 ORD: CNSL FOR APLT IN NOTE - 11 NO. 87-1068 W/I 10 DAYS IS NOTE - 12 DIRTD TO COMPLY WITH THIS CT'S NOTE - 12 1/11/89 ORDER OR SHOW CAUSE NOTE - 13 WHY HIS APPTMT SHOULD NOT BE NOTE - 13 VACATED. NOTE - 14 2/7/89 ORD GRT IN 87-854 APLT NOTE - 14 MO TO STAY APPEAL PENDING DISP NOTE - 15 ON MO TO VACATE SENT FILED IN NOTE - 15 THE SP CT AND SERV COPY ON NOTE - 16 THIS CT FUR ORD COUNSEL FOR NOTE - 16 APLT IN 30 DAYS SHALL ADVISE NOTE - 17 THIS CT REGARDING STATUS OF MO NOTE - 17 TO VACATE. FAILURE TO NOTIFY NOTE - 18 THIS CT W/IN 5 DAYS AFTER RE- NOTE - 18 CEIPT OF NOTICE OF DISP OF MO NOTE - 19 PENDING IN SP CT WILL BE NON- NOTE - 19 COMPLAINCE W/GEN RULES OF THIS NOTE - 20 COURT. NOTE - 20 NOTE - 21 4/19/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO. IN NOTE - 21 NO. 87-993 AND THE CLERK IS NOTE - 22 DIRTD TO FILE THE LODGED BRF NOTE - 22 OF APLT. FO THAT CNSL FOR APLT NOTE - 23 IN NO. 87-1068 SHALL ADVISE NOTE - 23 THIS COURT W/I 30 DAYS RE NOTE - 24 STATUS OF THE 32-110 MOTION NOTE - 24 PDG IN THE TRIAL COURT. FO NOTE - 25 THAT APPEAL NO. 87-1068 IS NOTE - 25 HEREBY SEVERED FROM APPEAL NOS NOTE - 26 87-854, 87-934 AND 87-993 W/O NOTE - 26 PREJ. TO BEING RECONSOLIDATED NOTE - 27 AFTER DISP. OF THE 23-110 MO. NOTE - 27 FILED IN THE TRIAL COURT. NOTE - 28 4/21/89 ORD: APPEAL NO. 87-854 NOTE - 28 IS HEREBY SEVERED FROM APPEAL NOTE - 29 NOS. 87-934 & 87-993 W/O PREJ. NOTE - 29 TO BEING RECONSOLIDATED AFTER NOTE - 30 DISPOSITION OF THE MOTION NOTE - 30 PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE SECTION NOTE - 31 23-110 FILED IN THE TRIAL CT. NOTE - 31 FO THAT THE BRF OF APLE IN NOS NOTE - 32 87-934 & 87-993 SHALL BE FILED NOTE - 32 W/I 30 DAYS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/11/08 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MORRISONW FOR - APLT BURROUGHS ATTY 2 - ANGELISC FOR - APLT JOHNSON ATTY 3 - VELTROPV FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 HAASR VACATED 10/19/88.
08/20/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT H. HAAS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 101987 SCHPRD R
10/30/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD DSA
11/06/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 110987 SCHPRD DSA
11/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (232 PGS - V. BREMEN) PB PANEL SCDATE 112087 SCHPRD RT
11/13/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S ADDENDUM TO THE DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987RECEIVED SECOND ADDENDUM TO APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 02. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (576 PGS. -- SWARINGER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD RT
03/24/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (187 PGS. -- WATKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/26/1988FiledRecord Completed
07/26/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (10 PGS - SIMMS) JB PANEL SCDATE 012988 SCHPRD CHECK
07/28/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-934 TO OCTOBER 5H (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/26/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO IN 87-934 FOR EX TO FILE BR TO 10/5-NFX; APLTS BR IN CON CASES DUE 9/6/88.EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1988APPEARANCE OF CARL ANGELIS AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (ROBERT H. HAAS) COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-854 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-1068 TO OCTOBER 17TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BA
09/07/1988RECEIVED PRO SE LETTERS FROM APPELLANT IN 87-1068 RE: RELEASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988RECEIVED PRO SE AFFIDAVIT FROM APLT RE: CONTACT WITH ATTORNEY RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/16/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S STATEMENT PURSUANT TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FILED 9/6/88 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/23/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-934 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1988LETTER TRANSMITTING AFFIDAVIT TO THE SUP. CT. FOR CONSIDERATION SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(39 PGS/SWARINGER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-1068 TO NOVEMBER 18TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-08. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 092988 SCHPRD M
10/31/1988ORDER DENY APLT PRO SE MO FOR RELEAS PENDING APPEAL IN 87-1068. ACG PANELFESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL IN 87-1068 PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO VACATE CONVICTION IN TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 111888 SCHPRD BA
11/15/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL IN 87-854 PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO VACATE SENTENCE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/28/88 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 112988 SCHPRD BA
12/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/27/89 (NO OPE) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11 THRU 21 IN NO. 87-1068 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1989RECEIVED COPY OF APPELLANT'S 23-110 MOTION TO VACATE CONVICTION AND SENTENCE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 1/27/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 13, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012789 SCHPRD BA
02/07/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 14-20 PB PANELRO SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD OPE
02/14/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/21/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S RECORD MATERIAL RELIED UPON (LIST) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/23/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (NO OPE) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11 THRU 13 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING MOTION PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE #23-110 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 21 THRU 27 SL PANELRO SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD CHECK
04/21/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 28 THRU 32 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 21ST (NO OPA) JB PANEL SCDATE 052289 SCHPRD BE
06/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/21/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 052689 SCHPRD CHECK
06/21/1989FiledBriefing Completed
06/21/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 062189 SCHPRD BE
07/10/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT TO JULY 17, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO 7-24-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 071989 SCHPRD RBA
07/24/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S RELPY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 071889 SCHPRD M
11/08/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/08/1989ARGUED PANELBESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELBESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/22/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD