judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEBORAH WHITE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-1069
Short Caption:DEBORAH WHITE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M3399-88Filed Date:08/16/1989

Opening Event Date:08/16/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/29/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/27/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/17/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDeborah White N
Roger C. Wesley NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Michael J. Dennis YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Glenn F. IveyYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WHITE, DEBORAH UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 88-686 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 06/13/90 ORD: GRANT APLT MO TO NOTE - 02 SUBSTITUE COUNS & THE APPNTMT NOTE - 03 OF ROGER WESLEY, ESQ., IS NOTE - 03 VACATED,& MICHAEL DENNIS, ESQ. NOTE - 04 IS APPOINTED TO REPRESENT APLT NOTE - 04 ON APPEAL. F/O NEWLY-APPOINTED NOTE - 05 COUNS TO ADVISE THIS CRT W/IN NOTE - 05 20 DAYS WHETHER HE INTENDS TO NOTE - 06 FL A SUPPLMNTL BRF ON BEHALF NOTE - 06 OF APLT.
01/01/1906 WESLEYR VACATED 6/13/90
11/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (36 PGS - TROUPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/01/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROGER C. WESLEY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1989ORDER SS, CONS 88-686 & 89-1069; ROGER WESLEY APPTD FOR APLT; APLT TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD DSA
12/13/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD R
12/29/1989FiledRecord Completed
12/29/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(9 PGS/TREMEL) AD PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD RT
03/09/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO DEEM BRIEF FILED IN 88-686 AS THE BRIEF FOR THIS APPEAL. GG PANEL SCDATE 020790 SCHPRD BA
03/09/1990RECEIVED APLT'S 2nd DOCKETING STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF **BRF OF APLT IN 88-686 DEEM- ED THE BRF IN THIS CASE** DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO DEEM BA IN 88-686 AS THE BA IN THIS CASE; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 032090 SCHPRD OPE
04/27/1990FiledBriefing Completed
04/27/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 043090 SCHPRD BE
05/18/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL J. DENNIS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 THUR 06 GW PANELRO SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD V
09/17/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/17/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD