judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IRA VERNELL MASON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0667
Short Caption:IRA VERNELL MASON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M13205-88Filed Date:06/07/1989

Opening Event Date:06/07/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/28/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/27/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/25/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantIra Vernell Mason N
Eugene M. Bond YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MASON, IRA VERNELL UNITED STATES
06/07/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) EUGENE M. BOND, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 070389 SCHPRD DSA
08/21/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD R
09/12/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (107 PGS. -- SWAGERTY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 122589 SCHPRD RT
11/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
04/17/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR REFER TO BPR. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD BA
04/23/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 042790 SCHPRD BA
05/29/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-28-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 052890 SCHPRD BE
06/22/1990ORDER GRNT APLE MO X TM TO FILE BRF TO 06-28-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 061990 SCHPRD GR
06/28/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/28/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 062890 SCHPRD BE
02/27/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/27/1991SUBMITTED PANELFEWGMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEWGMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/25/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD