judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM J. HAWTHORNE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0998
Short Caption:WILLIAM J. HAWTHORNE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3853-80Filed Date:08/21/1987

Opening Event Date:08/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/24/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/10/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/13/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/18/1989
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam J. Hawthorne Y
Richard S. StolkerYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Thomas J. Tourish, Jr.YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAWTHORNE, WILLIAM J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 SEE CO-DEFT, PERCY L. JETER - NOTE - 01 #87-939 NOTE - 03 10/6/88 ORD GRT APLT MO FO LV NOTE - 03 TO FL BRF, CLK TO FL BRF, & NOTE - 04 GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL NOTE - 04 BRF IN 87-939 APLT BRF DUE IN NOTE - 05 10 DAYS AND SCHD BE 30 DAYS NOTE - 05 THEREAFTER. NOTE - 06 031089 ORDER: GRANT APLE MOS & NOTE - 06 CLK TO FILE LDGD APLE BR; FO: NOTE - 07 GRANT ANITA ISCSON, ESQ. MO TO NOTE - 07 W/DRAW AS COUNSEL FOR APLT IN NOTE - 08 87-939; FO: CALVIN STEINMETZ, NOTE - 08 ESQ., AS COUNSEL TO REPRESENT NOTE - 09 APLT ON APPEAL; FO: CLK TO NOTE - 09 SCHED ON CAL ASAP. NOTE - 10 4/19/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO IN NOTE - 10 NO 87-939 AND ALL PROCEEDINGS NOTE - 11 IN NO 87-939 ARE HEREBY STAYED NOTE - 11 PDG DISP OF THE 23-110 MOTION NOTE - 12 FILED IN THE TRIAL COURT. FO NOTE - 12 THAT CNSL FOR APLT IN NO. NOTE - 13 87-939 SHALL ADVISE THIS COURT NOTE - 13 W/I 30 DAYS RE STATUS OF THE NOTE - 14 23-110 FILED IN THE TRIAL CT. NOTE - 14 FO THAT APPEAL NOS. 87-939 AND NOTE - 15 87-998 ARE HEREBY SEVERED W/O NOTE - 15 PREJ. TO BEING RECONSOLIDATED NOTE - 16 AFTER DISP OF THE 23-110 MO. NOTE - 16 FILED IN THE TRIAL COURT.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/09/13 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - STOLKERR FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BOLLWERKH FOR - APPELLEE
08/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD S. STOLKER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/08/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD DSA
10/13/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 102087 SCHPRD R
11/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (579 PGS RT-RHOADES) MLH PANEL SCDATE 110587 SCHPRD RT
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(23 PGS. -- FINNERIN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (9 PGS - SIMMS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2A(35 PGS - SCHOCH) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(VOL.I & II 1175 PGS TR PIRFO) GREG PANEL SCDATE 110387 SCHPRD RT
06/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (225 PGS - TREMEL) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1988FiledRecord Completed
06/27/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1988ORDER CONS 87-939 & 87-998; BRF OF APLTS DUE BY 8/8/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/6/88 (NO OPE) MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
09/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BA
09/19/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELD: PB PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-939 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/14/88 (NO OPA) PB GT PANEL SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD BE
12/12/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 13, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 121488 SCHPRD BE
12/30/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/13/89; NFX. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD OPA
01/11/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-13-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 011389 SCHPRD BE
02/22/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1989APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE BRF IN EXCESS OF PAGES RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF IN EXCESS OF 50 PAGES RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989FiledBriefing Completed
03/10/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06 - 09. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD OPA
03/14/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL UNTIL TRIAL COURT RULES ON MOTION TO VACATE SENTENCE IN 87-939 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 10 THRU 16 SL PANELRO SCDATE 032189 SCHPRD OPE
09/07/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO POSTPONE/CONTINUE ARGUMENT FOR SIX HENCE (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989ORDER DENY MO OF APLE TO CONTINUE ARGUMENT. DAS PANELFEBEPY SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD VS
09/13/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/13/1989ARGUED PANELFEBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/18/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT, PRO SE TO RECALL THE MANDATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/20/1990ORDER APLT'S PRO SE MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE IS DENIED. MEH PANELFEBEPY SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD VS
04/28/1992APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to recall the mandate of the dcca