judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALBERT P. CHILDS V UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0943
Short Caption:ALBERT P. CHILDS V UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M13699-88Filed Date:09/13/1989

Opening Event Date:09/13/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/06/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/11/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/13/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/05/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlbert P. Childs N
Jack Koppelman YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Kevin Ohlson YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CHILDS, ALBERT P. UNITED STATES
09/13/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JACK KOPPELMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
01/03/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (69 PGS/HART) AD PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD R
03/06/1990FiledRecord Completed
03/06/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(50 PGS/GLEASON) AD PANEL SCDATE 022190 SCHPRD RT
04/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF NUNC PRO TUNC FOR AN ADDITION- AL 30 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 041690 SCHPRD BA
05/07/1990RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1990ORDER APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FL LODGED BRIEF GRNTD. APLE'S BRIEF DUE IN 30 DAYS FRM DATE OF ORD. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 050490 SCHPRD Q
06/11/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/11/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 061190 SCHPRD BE
03/13/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/13/1991SUBMITTED PANELBESCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELBESCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/05/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD