judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LARRY L. MILLS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1021
Short Caption:LARRY L. MILLS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6683-86Filed Date:08/26/1987

Opening Event Date:08/26/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/21/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/10/1989
Argued/Submitted:04/05/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/30/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLarry L. Mills N
James W. KleinNY
David A. ReiserYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Glenn A. Fine YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MILLS, LARRY L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 080888 ORD: DENY MO TO REMAND NOTE - 01 W/O PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL IN NOTE - 02 THE EVENT THE TRIAL CRT NOTE - 02 INDICATES ITS WILLINGNESS TO NOTE - 03 GRANT AFFIRMATIVE RELIEF; APLE NOTE - 03 BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/04/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - REISERD FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FINEG FOR - APPELLEE
08/26/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/28/1987STATEMENT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 092187 SCHPRD DSA
09/10/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/10/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 102687 SCHPRD R
09/21/1987FiledRecord Completed
09/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(190 PGS. -- PAVLISH) RJG PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD RT
09/22/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOV. 17TH (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD BA
11/17/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 111787 SCHPRD BA
12/22/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 21ST (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 122287 SCHPRD BE
01/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 23, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012188 SCHPRD MXBE
01/27/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/23/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 012288 SCHPRD X
02/23/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO REMAND FOR SUPPLEMENTATION OF RECORD AND ENTRY OF ADDITIONAL FIND- INGS PB PANEL SCDATE 022388 SCHPRD BE
03/03/1988APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REMAND AND TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD PB PANEL SCDATE 030788 SCHPRD OPA
08/08/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 ACG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR STAY (JOINT MOTION) APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 090788 SCHPRD BE
10/05/1988ORDER GRANT JOINT MO TO STAY & PART- IES TO FL STATE IN 30 AS TO STATUS OF PROCEEDINGS IN TRL. PANELPY SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD Q
11/03/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT & APPELLEE ON STATUS OF TRIAL COURT PROCEEDINGS GT PANEL SCDATE 110488 SCHPRD ANSA
12/14/1988ORDER PARTIES IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO PENDING IN TRIAL COURT. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 120188 SCHPRD CHECK
01/03/1989STATEMENT OF PARTIES (JOINT) REGARDING STATUS OF PROCEEDINGS IN THE TRIAL COURT GT PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD ANSA
02/06/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1989FiledBriefing Completed
02/10/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXPEDITE & CLK TO FL BE & SCHED CASE ON APRIL CALENDAR. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 020889 SCHPRD Q
03/17/1989APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO (NO OPE) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL POST- HEARING & REPLY BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL SUPP & REPLY BRF & CLK TO FL. DAS PANELMK SCDATE 032789 SCHPRD CHECK
03/23/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/05/1989ARGUED PANELRGTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(74 PGS WRAY) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/30/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD