judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC G. LOCKLEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-1020
Short Caption:ERIC G. LOCKLEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2068-87Filed Date:08/26/1987

Opening Event Date:08/26/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/02/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/10/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/06/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/26/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric G. Lockley N
James W. KleinNY
Blaise S. Supler YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Mary B. Murphy YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LOCKLEY, ERIC G. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/12/06 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SUPLERB FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MURPHYMAR FOR - APPELLEE
08/26/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/10/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1987RECEIVED NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED BY APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/16/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 092187 SCHPRD DSA
10/19/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 102687 SCHPRD R
03/15/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (15 PGS - BURNS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1988FiledRecord Completed
05/02/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (709 PGS - TREMEL) JB PANEL SCDATE 042088 SCHPRD RT
05/03/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL ALL TRANSCRIPT IS FILED GT (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 061388 SCHPRD BA
07/27/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (107 PGS RT - BURNEY) GT PANEL SCDATE 062988 SCHPRD RT
08/23/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/23/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (19 PGS RT - JANIFER) GT PANEL SCDATE 060188 SCHPRD RT
09/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF PENDING RECEIPT OF CURRENTLY ORDERED TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD BA
10/12/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(5 PGS/TREMEL) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101288 SCHPRD M
01/31/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6(101 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 121588 SCHPRD RT
03/10/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-10-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD BA
04/10/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 10TH (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/10/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 042089 SCHPRD CHECK
05/09/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/24/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 051089 SCHPRD BA
05/22/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/24/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 051289 SCHPRD Q
05/25/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (NO OPP0) AD PANEL SCDATE 052489 SCHPRD BA
05/25/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV & BRF OF APLT IS FL; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 060589 SCHPRD CHECK
06/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 3RD (NO OPA) JB PANEL SCDATE 070589 SCHPRD BE
07/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/3/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD CHECK
08/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/1/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 080389 SCHPRD BE
08/29/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/1/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081589 SCHPRD OPA
09/01/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD -AMENDED BE FILED 10/10/89 PANEL SCDATE 090189 SCHPRD BE
09/14/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLE TO FILE COPY OF AMENDED BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1989RECEIVED AMENDED APLE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/10/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AMENDED BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 100589 SCHPRD M
11/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/06/1989ARGUED PANELRGNWPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1989ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO FL REPLY BRF. GW PANELRONWPY SCDATE 113089 SCHPRD VS
12/08/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGNWPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/26/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD