judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALFRED JAMES CARTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-1200
Short Caption:ALFRED JAMES CARTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M10868-89Filed Date:10/17/1989

Opening Event Date:10/17/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlfred James Carter N
Andrew J. DelehantyNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CARTER, ALFRED JAMES a/k/a AHMAD MUHAMMAD UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL PROVIDED NOTE - 01 APPELLANT W/I 10 DAYS FROM THE NOTE - 02 DATEOF THIS ORDER SUBMITS A NOTE - 02 STATEMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH NOTE - 03 JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES, 513 NOTE - 03 A.2D 798 (D.C. 1986).
10/17/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/19/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT APPEAL FROM CONDITIONS OF RELEASE AND MOTION TO EXPEDITE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANDREW J.J. DELEHANTY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD R
10/23/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD DSA
10/24/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD CHECK
11/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD BA
11/21/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO ADD AFFIDAVIT T0 MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1989ORDER APLT'S MO TO WITHDRAW APPEAL IS DENIED W/O (SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3) JJ PANELRO SCDATE 111789 SCHPRD Q
12/22/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/22/1989ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PURSUANT TO APLT'S OWN MOTION. CWC PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
01/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD