judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BILLIE GIBSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-1128
Short Caption:BILLIE GIBSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M7636-89Filed Date:09/22/1989

Opening Event Date:09/22/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/05/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/20/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBillie Gibson N
Thomas T. Ruffin, Jr.NY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GIBSON, BILLIE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 01/18/90 ORD: APLT SUBMITS A NOTE - 01 STMT W/IN 10 DAYS IN ACCORD. NOTE - 02 WITH JOHNSON V. US, 513 A.2D NOTE - 02 798 (D.C. 1986). NOTE - 03 SUA SPONTE, FOR LACK OF JURIS. NOTE - 03 ARLT V. US 562 A.2D 633 (1989) NOTE - 04 KWAKYE V. DC, 494 A.2D 643 NOTE - 04 (1985).
09/22/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/26/1989ORDER APLT TO SHOW CAUSE W/I 30 DAYS WHY APPEAL SHOULDN'T BE DIS- FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. MEH PANELMISSED SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD CHECK
12/13/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD R
12/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 112589 SCHPRD CHECK
01/18/1990ORDER DENYING MOT TO DISMISS W/OUT PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL PROVIDED (SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 & 2) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(149 PGS/LEIDIG-TAPE) AD PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD RT
03/30/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/30/1990ORDER DENYING APLT'S MOT TO W/DRAW APPEAL; FO APPEAL DISMISSED, (SEE NOTE FIELDS 3 & 4) FVH PANELFETEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
04/20/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD