judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NICHOLAS GOMEZ V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-1094
Short Caption:NICHOLAS GOMEZ V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M13949-88Filed Date:09/18/1989

Opening Event Date:09/18/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/22/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/31/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/05/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/10/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNicholas Gomez N
Betty M. Ballester NN
AppellantNicholas Gomez N
James G. Mcguire YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GOMEZ, NICHOLAS UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 012290 ORD: MOTION OF BETTY NOTE - 01 M. HUNTER, ESQ TO WITHDRAW IS NOTE - 02 GRANTED; F/O JAMES G. MCGUIRE, NOTE - 02 ESQ ENTERED AS COUNSEL FOR NOTE - 03 APLT; F/O APLT'S MO TO EXT TM NOTE - 03 TO FL BRF GRANTED TO 2/9/90. NOTE - 04 05/14/90 ORD: GRANT APLT'S MO NOTE - 04 & CLK OF THE SUPERIOR COURT IS NOTE - 05 DIR TO TRANSMIT THE TRANSCRIPT NOTE - 05 OF THE 6/1/89 PROCEEDING TO NOTE - 06 THIS CT AS A SUPPLMNTAL RECORD NOTE - 06 FORTHWITH.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/12/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MCGUIREJA FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - WEISSC FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 HUNTERB VACATED 1/22/90
09/18/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BETTY M. HUNTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
10/11/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (191 PGS. -- RONAN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 111789 SCHPRD R
12/18/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM TANNER - 6/30/89 PROCEEDING JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO REMOVE BETTY HUNTER AS COUNSEL AND APPT. JAMES G. MCGUIRE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-9-90 NO OPPOO AD PANEL SCDATE 112089 SCHPRD BA
01/22/1990FiledRecord Completed
01/22/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JAMES G. McGUIRE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD M
02/09/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 12, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 020990 SCHPRD BA
02/21/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(17 PGS/RAMOS) AD PANEL SCDATE 022090 SCHPRD RT
03/07/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/12/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 022790 SCHPRD V
03/16/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 20, 1990 PANEL SCDATE 031290 SCHPRD BA
03/23/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990ORDER GRT APLT'S MOTIONS & THE BRIEF OF APLT IS FILED. FO APLE'S BRF BE FL W/I 30 DAYS OF ORDER PANELRBH SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD B
04/19/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (25 PGS. -- SHELTON; 25 PGS -- SHELTON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 THUR 6 GW PANELRO SCDATE 050790 SCHPRD V
05/15/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 31, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 051790 SCHPRD BE
05/30/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/31/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 051890 SCHPRD B
05/31/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/31/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD BE
12/04/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/05/1990ARGUED PANELFEBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/25/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT TO FILE RBA; APLE MAY RESPOND IN 15 DAYS. MEH PANELFEBESC SCDATE 120590 SCHPRD VS
02/25/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFESCBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -SW CITE 597 A.2d 884
09/30/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 2883
10/15/1991MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC OF APLT TO 10/30/91 PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1991ORDER APLT'S MOT IS GRNTD & PET FOR REHEARING EN BANC SHALL BE FLD ON OR BEFORE 10/30/91. SL PANELROGERS SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/10/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD