judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CAMERON CLARKE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0956
Short Caption:CAMERON CLARKE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M2147-89Filed Date:07/24/1989

Opening Event Date:07/24/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/13/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCameron Clarke N
Patrick A. Hyde NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CLARKE, CAMERON UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 042790 ORD: APLT SHALL SHOW NOTE - 01 CAUSE W/I 10 DAYS FROM DATE OF NOTE - 02 ORDER WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT NOTE - 02 BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO NOTE - 03 MOLINARO V. JERSEY, 396 U.S. NOTE - 03 365 (1970).
07/24/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/04/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PATRICK A. HYDE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (109 PGS. -- RAMOS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD R
11/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD BA
11/15/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO SET BRIEFING DATES RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1989ORDER GRTG MOT TO SET BRIEFING SCH & BA DUE W/IN 40 DAYS; BE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/26/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM FRANKLIN - 5/5/89 PROCEEDING (DUP REQUEST) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 011890 SCHPRD BA
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (60-PGS/FRANKLIN) AJ PANEL SCDATE 120789 SCHPRD RT
02/06/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXTEND TO THE EXTENT THAT BR IS FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORD JB PANELDDW SCDATE 020190 SCHPRD U
03/16/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 16, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 031990 SCHPRD BA
04/11/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 GW PANELRO SCDATE 041990 SCHPRD V
06/22/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/22/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO W/D CASE FOR FAIL- URE OF APLT TO PURSUE APPEAL. DAS PANELFETEFA SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD V
06/22/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
07/13/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD