judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MELINDA ANN ANDREWS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0976
Short Caption:MELINDA ANN ANDREWS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M5883-89Filed Date:08/02/1989

Opening Event Date:08/02/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/20/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/20/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ANDREWS, MELINDA ANN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/14/89 ORD: SUA SPONTE THAT NOTE - 01 APLT SHALL SHOW CAUSE IF CAUSE NOTE - 02 THERE BE W/I 10 DAYS FM DATE NOTE - 02 OF THIS ORDER WHY THIS APPEAL NOTE - 03 SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK NOTE - 03 OF JURISDICTION AS HAVING BEEN NOTE - 04 NOTED FROM A NON-FINAL ORDER NOTE - 04 FOR THE PURPOSE OF APPEAL.
08/02/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/12/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD R
09/14/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1989FiledRecord Completed
11/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(62 PGS/EDLEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 101289 SCHPRD RT
05/30/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
05/30/1990ORDER CASE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 092589 SCHPRD ANSA
05/30/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
06/20/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD