judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEROY CAUTHEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-1216
Short Caption:LEROY CAUTHEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M2593-89Filed Date:10/06/1989

Opening Event Date:10/06/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/27/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/20/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/24/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/09/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeroy Cauthen N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Julia L. Leighton YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CAUTHEN, LEROY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 5/22/90 ORD: GRT APLT MO FOR NOTE - 01 LV TO LATE FL LODGED BRF, APLE NOTE - 02 BRIEF SHALL BE FL W/IN 30 DAYS NOTE - 02 FROM DTD OF ORDER. NOTE - 03 101990 ORD: APLT'S MOTION FOR NOTE - 03 LV TO FILE REPLY BRIEF GRANTED NOTE - 04 & LODGED BRIEF FILED; F/O APLE NOTE - 04 MOTION FOR STUDENT COUNSEL, NOTE - 05 KAREN L. MELNIK TO ARGUE FOR NOTE - 05 THE UNITED STATES IS GRANTED.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/10/24 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LEIGHTONJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MELNIKK FOR - APPELLEE
10/06/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/26/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PANEL SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD DSA
11/17/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT FVH PANEL SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD K
12/08/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD R
02/27/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/27/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (147-PGS/VBREMEN) AJ PANEL SCDATE 012690 SCHPRD RT
04/09/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-9-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD BA
04/23/1990ORDER GRT APLT'S MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 5/9/90. NFX JJ PANEL SCDATE 041390 SCHPRD B
05/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1990RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD BA
05/22/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 THRU 02. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 051190 SCHPRD B
06/22/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 20, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 062190 SCHPRD BE
07/13/1990ORDER GRNT APLE MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 07-20-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 070690 SCHPRD GR
07/20/1990FiledBriefing Completed
07/20/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 072090 SCHPRD BE
09/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1990LETTER APLT'S REQUEST TO ARGUE IS GRANTED. CT PANELFF SCDATE 090490 SCHPRD OPE
10/04/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1990RECEIVED APLT'S REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLE FOR LEAVE TO PERMIT STUDENT COUNSEL TO ARGUE APPEAL FOR THE US AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1990RECEIVED APPROVAL OF THE US ATTORNEY FOR STUDENT COUNSEL TO ARGUE FOR THE US. AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03-05. MEH PANELSTFAKN SCDATE 100590 SCHPRD VS
10/19/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 101590 SCHPRD CHECK
10/24/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/24/1990ARGUED PANELSTFAKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1991REVERSED JUDGMENT RV JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELSTFAKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - RV METH -OPN JUDGE -FA CITE 592 A.2d 1611
06/07/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FA PAGE # - 1611 OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - KN PAGE # - 0000 OPINION TYPE D JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 0000
06/21/1991MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC OF APLT PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1991ORDER GRT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET AND PET FOR REH EB SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEF 7/5/91 SL PANELRO SCDATE 070891 SCHPRD OPE
07/09/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD