judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DERRICK A. JONES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0694
Short Caption:DERRICK A. JONES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Destruction Of Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M1261-86Filed Date:06/01/1989

Opening Event Date:06/01/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/28/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDerrick A. Jones N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JONES, DERRICK A. UNITED STATES
06/01/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/26/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 070689 SCHPRD DSA
07/06/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
07/06/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO W/D CASE & CASE DISMISSED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD CHECK
07/06/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
07/28/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD