judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRIMALDI (TIM) VS. STATE C/W 37550

Case Information: 38109
Short Caption:GRIMALDI (TIM) VS. STATE C/W 37550Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 37550 *, 38109Related Case(s): 33508 , 37329 , 37550 , 43608 , 54535 , 63459
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C17442Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/07/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/29/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-11071
07/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 37685/37761/38086/38107/38108/38109/38112-cases are not consolidated. 01-12555
11/07/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. 01-18592
11/07/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/18/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP02-MS/RR/NB. Nos. 37550/38109. 01-21278
01/15/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00572
01/15/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/01/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2002. 02-00572