judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LILLIAN M. VARGAS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-165)
Case Number:06-165Case Docketed On:07/18/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:LILLIAN M. VARGAS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LILLIAN M. VARGAS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLillian M. VargasKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/18/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/18/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/18/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/01/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/05/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/16/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/30/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with wavier (faxed)MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
12/01/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
12/01/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/05/2006Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal (original)Notice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal