judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERNEST M. GREELY, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0899
Short Caption:ERNEST M. GREELY, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-3379-10Filed Date:06/28/2010

Opening Event Date:06/28/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/02/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantErnest M. Greely, Jr.Y
William T. MorrisonNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/04/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that William T. Morrison, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/04/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) William T. Morrison, Esquire
09/22/2010 On consideration of this court's order of August 4, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
09/30/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
09/30/2010RECEIVED - aplt's statement regarding transcipts and motion for appeal transcript
10/08/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (JAC)
10/08/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed)
12/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (11pgs/Tape) 4/14/10 proc.
12/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (9pgs/Tape) 6/22/10 proc. w/CD
12/02/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/09/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/09/2010RECORD INDEX
12/09/2010RECORD COPIES
12/28/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2/17/11 NO OPPO
01/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 17, 2011. (JAC)
02/23/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) Granted
03/02/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL NO LATER THAN MARCH 24, 2011 file any response showing, with specificity any reason why counsel's motion should not be granted and the conviction, order or judgment on appeal affirmed... FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION OF COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL TO WITHDRAW IS HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending appelant's response to this order. (BY: ETW) LW
03/02/2011TMC - motion to withdraw (ANDERS)
05/10/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO WITHDRAW IS GRANTED. See Anders v. California... It is ****MORE*****
05/10/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is AFFIRMED. (FITEST)
06/02/2011MANDATE ISSUED